EP0464170 - DEVELOPMENT APPARATUS HAVING DUAL INTERLEAVING PADDLE MIXERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILBERT, Thomas K. c/o Eastman Kodak Co., Patent Dept., 343 State St. Rochester, NY 14650 / US | [1994/31] |
Former [1992/02] | 01 /
HILBERT, Thomas, K. 3497 Brockport-Spencerport Road Spencerport, NY 14559 / US | Representative(s) | Blickle, K. Werner, et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91902397.8 | 11.12.1990 | [1992/02] | WO1990US07249 | Priority number, date | US19890451853 | 18.12.1989 Original published format: US 451853 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109350 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464170 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464170 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, B01F7/04 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G03G15/0822 (EP,US);
B01F27/702 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/31] |
Former [1992/02] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | ENTWICKLUNGSGERÄT MIT ZWEI INEINANDER GREIFENDEN SCHAUFELMISCHERN | [1992/02] | English: | DEVELOPMENT APPARATUS HAVING DUAL INTERLEAVING PADDLE MIXERS | [1992/02] | French: | APPAREIL DE DEVELOPPEMENT A MELANGEURS A DOUBLE PALES INTERCALEES | [1992/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB2030463 [ ] (RISCO BREVETTI); | GB1039682 [ ] (PARKER LTD FREDERICK); | US4634286 [ ] (PIKE SUSAN C [US]); | US4546060 [ ] (MISKINIS EDWARD T [US], et al) | [Y] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, vol. 25, no. 2, July 1982, (New York, US), J.A. Knepper et al.: "Xerographic developer", pages 512-515 |