EP0539368 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A PLATE WITH AT LEAST ONE UPWARDS-FACING WELL DESIGNED TO HOLD CHEMICAL AND/OR BIOCHEMICAL AND/OR MICROBIOLOGICAL SUBSTANCES, AND A PLATE THUS PRODUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIGEN, Manfred Dehio-Weg 14 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
SIMM, Wolfgang Bahnhofstrasse 3a D-3405 Rosdorf 1 / DE | [1993/18] | Representative(s) | Witte, Alexander, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91902423.2 | 29.01.1991 | [1993/18] | WO1991DE00083 | Priority number, date | DE19904022794 | 18.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4022794 | [1993/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201549 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0539368 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0539368 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/10 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
B29C51/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PLATTE MIT ZUMINDEST EINER NACH OBEN OFFENEN MULDE ZUR AUFNAHME VON CHEMISCHEN UND/ODER BIOCHEMISCHEN UND/ODER MIKROBIOLOGISCHEN SUBSTANZEN UND NACH DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE PLATTE | [1993/18] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A PLATE WITH AT LEAST ONE UPWARDS-FACING WELL DESIGNED TO HOLD CHEMICAL AND/OR BIOCHEMICAL AND/OR MICROBIOLOGICAL SUBSTANCES, AND A PLATE THUS PRODUCED | [1993/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN PUITS OUVERT VERS LE HAUT DESTINE A RECEVOIR DES SUBSTANCES CHIMIQUES ET/OU BIOCHIMIQUES ET/OU MICROBIOLOGIQUES ET PLAQUE FABRIQUEE SELON CE PROCEDE | [1993/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 10.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.11.1994 | AT | 29.01.1995 | [1996/28] |
Former [1995/35] | NL | 02.11.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP63293034 ; | DE1251010 [ ]; | US1482789 [ ] (GMELIN EUGENE C); | CH275726 [ ] (MUELLER WELT GMBH [DE]); | FR1431684 [ ] | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Band 13, Nr. 118 (M-806)(3466), 23. März 1989; & JP-A-63293034 (TAKASHI MORI), 30. November 1988, & JP63293034 A 00000000 | Examination | US3007206 |