EP0454844 - INCREASED ACTIVITY PRECIPITATED PHOTOGRAPHIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARI, Krishnan 33 West Squire Drive Rochester, NY 14623 / US | 02 /
BOWMAN, Wayne, Arthur 4822 Lewis Road Walworth, NY 14658 / US | 03 /
THOMAS, Brian 76 Huxley Way Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91902470.3 | 14.11.1990 | [1991/45] | WO1990US06491 | Priority number, date | US19890440160 | 22.11.1989 Original published format: US 440160 | [1991/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108516 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454844 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454844 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/388 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
G03C7/388 (EP,US);
Y10S430/136 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/25] |
Former [1991/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | AUSGEFÄLLTE PHOTOGRAPHISCHE MATERIALIEN ERHÖHTER AKTIVITÄT | [1998/06] | English: | INCREASED ACTIVITY PRECIPITATED PHOTOGRAPHIC MATERIALS | [1991/45] | French: | MATERIAUX PHOTOGRAPHIQUES PRECIPITES A ACTIVITE AMELIOREE | [1991/45] |
Former [1991/45] | ERHÖHTE AKTIVITÄTSAUSGEFÄLLTE MATERIALIEN | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1141275 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]GB1193349 (ILFORD LTD); | [Y]US4199363 (CHEN TSANG J [US]); | [A]US4378425 (SCHNOERING HILDEGARD [DE], et al); | [Y]US4419441 (NITTEL FRITZ [DE], et al); | [Y]US4818667 (HAMADA FUMIO [JP], et al); | [XP]US4970139 (BAGCHI PRANAB [US]) | Examination | US2801170 |