EP0465620 - PROCESS FOR REMOVING OIL FROM FINELY DIVIDED SOLID MATERIAL, ESPECIALLY METAL-CONTAINING PRODUCTION WASTE AND SOILED FLOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PREUSSAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Karl-Wiechert-Allee 4 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states PREUSSAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Karl-Wiechert-Allee 4 D-30625 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRALHER, Manfred Reussstrasse 18 D-3380 Goslar / DE | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1994/35] |
Former [1992/03] | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-Ing. Lucas H. Haar Dipl.-oec.troph. Gabriele Schwarz-Haar Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 23 D-61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91902658.3 | 26.01.1991 | [1992/03] | WO1991DE00077 | Priority number, date | DE19904002478 | 29.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4002478 | DE19904027787 | 01.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4027787 | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111543 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465620 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465620 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C23G1/24, C23G3/00 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
C23G3/00 (EP);
B09C1/02 (EP);
C23G1/24 (EP);
C23G1/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTÖLUNG VON KLEINTEILIGEM FESTSTOFFGUT, INSBESONDERE METALLHALTIGEN PRODUKTIONSRÜCKSTÄNDEN UND VERUNREINIGTEN BÖDEN | [1992/03] | English: | PROCESS FOR REMOVING OIL FROM FINELY DIVIDED SOLID MATERIAL, ESPECIALLY METAL-CONTAINING PRODUCTION WASTE AND SOILED FLOORS | [1992/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE DESHUILAGE DES PRODUITS SOLIDES A PARTICULES DE FAIBLE DIMENSION, EN PARTICULIER LES RESIDUS DE PRODUCTION CONTENANT DES METAUX ET LES SOLS SOUILLES | [1992/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.04.1995 | DK | 12.04.1995 | GR | 12.04.1995 | NL | 12.04.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/05] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
GR | 12.04.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 12.04.1995 | |
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/05] | BE | 12.04.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3810786 (LINDGREN B); | [Y]FR2361478 (PRAB CONVEYORS [US]); | [Y]EP0019752 (DERUSTIT GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3434128 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) | Examination | - W.R.A. Vauck, H.A. Müller: "Grundoperationen chemischer Verfahrenstechnik", Seite 328, 6. Auflage, 1982 |