EP0509049 - METHOD FOR PREDICTING ATHEROSCLEROTIC RISK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION 330 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [1992/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSSEL, Eric, T. 66 Priscilla Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | 02 /
McDONAGH, Jan 66 Priscilla Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Kupecz, Arpad, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | Kupecz, A., Drs. c.s., et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 NL-1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 91902894.4 | 21.12.1990 | [1992/43] | WO1990US07622 | Priority number, date | US19890454069 | 21.12.1989 Original published format: US 454069 | US19900630520 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: US 630520 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110128 | Date: | 11.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509049 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.07.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/46, G01N24/08, G01N33/92, A61B5/055 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
G01R33/465 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VORAUSSAGEN VON ATHEROSKLEROTISCHEN RISIKEN | [1992/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PREDICTING ATHEROSCLEROTIC RISK | [1992/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREDICTION DE RISQUE ATHEROSCLEREUX | [1992/43] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1992 | Search fee paid | 22.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 11.01.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0234524 ; | [AP]EP0361214 | [A] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE. vol. 59, no. 2, 1 September 1984, ORLANDO, MN US pages 268 - 274; S. COFFIN ET AL.: 'CORRELATION OF 13C AND 1H CHEMICAL SHIFTS IN BOVINE HIGH-DENSITY LIPOPROTEIN FROM TWO-DIMENSIONAL NMR' | [A] - JOURNAL OF LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY vol. 11, no. 3, 1 March 1988, NEW YORK, (US) pages 647 - 664; G.N. CHMURNY ET AL.: 'A COMPARISON OF HIGH PERFORMANCE GEL PERMEATION CHROMATOGRAPHY AND NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPY IN THE ANALYSIS OF PLASMA FROM NORMAL SUBJECTS AND CANCER PATIENTS' | [AD] - FEBS LETTERS. vol. 219, no. 1, 13 July 1987, AMSTERDAM NL pages 239 - 243; J.D. BELL ET AL.: '1H NMR STUDIES OF HUMAN BLOOD PLASMA' | International search | [XP]US4940055 ; | [A]US4200588 |