EP0592398 - APPARATUS FOR MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL, RESPECTIVELY, OF TEMPERATURE AND/OR PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tour & Andersson Hydronics Aktiebolag Box 300 520 30 Ljung / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states Tour & Andersson Hydronics Aktiebolag Box 300 S-520 30 Ljung / SE | ||
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states TOUR & ANDERSSON AB Svärdlangsvägen 46 S-121 72 Johanneshov / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLANSK, Leif Sandbäcken S-513 00 Fristad / SE | 02 /
MARSTORP, Leif Marstorp S-520 30 Ljung / SE | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Siebmanns, Hubertus, et al Gotapatent AB, Box 154 561 22 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Siebmanns, Hubertus, et al Gotapatent AB, Box 154 S-561 22 Huskvarna / SE | Application number, filing date | 91903070.0 | 15.01.1991 | [1994/16] | WO1991SE00024 | Priority number, date | SE19900000125 | 15.01.1990 Original published format: SE 9000125 | SE19900002744 | 28.08.1990 Original published format: SE 9002744 | [1994/16] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110852 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0592398 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592398 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/22 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
F24D19/0002 (EP,US);
F16K27/02 (EP,US);
F24D19/088 (EP,US);
F24D19/1036 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8376 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/16] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR MESSUNG UND STEUERUNG VON TEMPERATUR UND/ODER DRUCK | [1994/16] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL, RESPECTIVELY, OF TEMPERATURE AND/OR PRESSURE | [1994/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE MESURE ET DE REGULATION DE TEMPERATURE ET/OU DE PRESSION | [1994/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.1992 | Translation filed | 29.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.06.1992 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 09.07.1997 | [1998/12] | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1110157 (TOUR AGENTURER AB); | [A]EP0153427 (MEGES A & R TECH HELMUT [DE]); | [A]EP0221464 (OVENTROP SOHN KG F W [DE]) |