EP0469105 - DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING BAGS FROM A THERMALLY WELDABLE STRIP, AND FOR FILLING AND SEALING SUCH BAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROVEMA Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH Postfach 20 35461 Fernwald / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states ROVEMA VERPACKUNGSMASCHINEN GMBH Postfach 20 D-35461 Fernwald / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMMLER, Roman Philosophenstrasse 27a D-6520 Worms 1 / DE | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Missling, Arne Böck Tappe Kollegen Ludwigsplatz 9 35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Missling, Arne, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 D-35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91903228.4 | 18.02.1991 | [1992/06] | WO1991DE00122 | Priority number, date | DE19904005078 | 17.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4005078 | [1992/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112177 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0469105 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469105 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/30 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
B29C66/83543 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/4312 (EP,US);
B29C66/81431 (EP,US);
B29C66/81465 (EP,US);
B29C66/8161 (EP,US);
B29C66/8181 (EP,US);
B29C66/8432 (EP,US);
B29C66/849 (EP,US);
B65B51/30 (EP,US);
B29C66/9221 (EP,US);
B29C66/9241 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN, FÜLLEN UND VERSCHLIESSEN VON BEUTELN AUS EINEM HEISSVERSIEGELBAREN BAND | [1992/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING BAGS FROM A THERMALLY WELDABLE STRIP, AND FOR FILLING AND SEALING SUCH BAGS | [1992/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION, DE REMPLISSAGE ET DE FERMETURE DE SACHETS CONSTITUES D'UNE BANDE SCELLABLE A CHAUD | [1992/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1329553 [ ]; | CH433100 [ ] (HESSER AG MASCHF [DE]); | DE1815029 [ ] (MIRA PAK INC); | FR2106682 [ ] (PRATT MFG CORP); | CH531440 [ ] (HESSER AG MASCHF [DE]); | FR2512777 [ ] (MAPA SPA [IT]) |