EP0515414 - WEB CLEANING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | |||
Former [1992/49] | For:GB
Kodak Limited Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITNEY, Roger Arthur 51 Lansdown Road Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 2RZ / GB | 02 /
COX, Raymond John 21 Brook Drive Ruislip, Middlesex HA4 8AG / GB | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Mackett, Margaret, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 91903320.9 | 11.02.1991 | [1992/49] | WO1991EP00283 | Priority number, date | GB19900003283 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: GB 9003283 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112095 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0515414 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0515414 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B08B6/00 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
B08B6/00 (EP);
B08B5/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VOR BEWEGTEN BAHNEN | [1992/49] | English: | WEB CLEANING APPARATUS | [1992/49] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DE BANDES | [1992/49] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.1994 | CH | 01.06.1994 | DK | 01.06.1994 | ES | 01.06.1994 | GR | 01.06.1994 | IT | 01.06.1994 | LI | 01.06.1994 | SE | 01.09.1994 | LU | 28.02.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 01.06.1994 | |
CH | 01.06.1994 | ||
DK | 01.06.1994 | ||
GR | 01.06.1994 | ||
IT | 01.06.1994 | ||
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
LU | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 01.06.1994 | |
CH | 01.06.1994 | ||
DK | 01.06.1994 | ||
IT | 01.06.1994 | ||
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 01.06.1994 | |
CH | 01.06.1994 | ||
DK | 01.06.1994 | ||
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 01.06.1994 | |
CH | 01.06.1994 | ||
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/05] | CH | 01.06.1994 | |
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | CH | 01.06.1994 | |
LI | 01.06.1994 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2179707 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0245526 (ELTEX ELEKTROSTATIK GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US4727614 (SWISTUN GWIDO K [US]) |