EP0516640 - QUICK-ACTION CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. ACEC TRANSPORT 50/52 rue Cambier Dupret 6001 Charleroi / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states S.A. ACEC TRANSPORT 50/52 rue Cambier Dupret B-6001 Charleroi / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOCHOUSE, Roland 10, rue Vieille-Voie-de-Liège B-4140 Sprimont / BE | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière B-4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 91903322.5 | 18.02.1991 | [1992/50] | WO1991BE00013 | Priority number, date | EP19900870030 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: EP 90870030 | [1992/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113452 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516640 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516640 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/60, H01H33/28, H01H3/22 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
H01H3/605 (EP,US);
H01H3/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/50] | Title | German: | SCHNELLWIRKENDER LASTSCHALTER | [1992/50] | English: | QUICK-ACTION CIRCUIT BREAKER | [1992/50] | French: | DISJONCTEUR HYPER-RAPIDE | [1992/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.1993 | DK | 13.10.1993 | GR | 13.10.1993 | SE | 13.10.1993 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
DK | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/27] | SE | 13.10.1993 | Cited in | International search | DE6606297U [ ]; | FR2438333 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | EP0184566 [ ] (ACEC [BE]); | DD240974 [ ] (LIEBKNECHT TRANSFORMAT [DD]); | EP0348584 [ ] (ACEC [BE]) |