Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
03.09.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] |
06.05.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |
10.12.1993 | Change - applicant | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] |
30.09.1993 | First examination report | |
03.10.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] |
03.10.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] |