EP0513105 - DEVICE FOR ATTACHING A RAIL TO A CONCRETE OR METAL SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLEVARD 320 Bureaux de la Colline F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states Allevard 320 Bureaux de la Colline F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | ||
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states Allevard Industries 320 Brx de la Colline F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUVAL, Philippe 51, rue Jean-Baptiste-Lebas F-59500 Lambres-lez-Douai / FR | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91903328.2 | 29.01.1991 | [1992/47] | WO1991FR00049 | Priority number, date | FR19900001086 | 30.01.1990 Original published format: FR 9001086 | [1992/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111556 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513105 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513105 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E01B9/30 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
E01B9/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [1992/47] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON EISENBAHNSCHIENEN AUF EINEM BETON- ODER METALLTRÄGER | [1992/47] | English: | DEVICE FOR ATTACHING A RAIL TO A CONCRETE OR METAL SUPPORT | [1992/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE RAIL DE CHEMIN DE FER SUR UN SUPPORT EN BETON OU EN METAL | [1992/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 18.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.06.1994 | IT | 22.06.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 22.06.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH330397 (BAYLISS JONES & BAYLISS LIMITE [GB]); | [A]GB1169715 (BRITISH RAILWAYS BOARD [GB]); | [A]FR2627519 (ALLEVARD IND SA [FR]) |