EP0513166 - PREASSEMBLED AIR DATA SENSOR AND TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT INC. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [1992/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGEN, Floyd, W. 15802 Cedar Ridge Road Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91904012.1 | 14.01.1991 | [1992/47] | WO1991US00272 | Priority number, date | US19900472344 | 30.01.1990 Original published format: US 472344 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111789 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513166 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/17, G08B21/00 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
G01P5/17 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/47] | G08B21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | PREASSEMBLIERTER LUFTDATENSENSOR UND -UMFORMER | [1992/47] | English: | PREASSEMBLED AIR DATA SENSOR AND TRANSDUCER | [1992/47] | French: | CAPTEUR ET TRANSDUCTEUR PRE-ASSEMBLES D'INFORMATIONS AEROLOGIQUES | [1992/47] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.1992 | Search fee paid | 01.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 01.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/08] | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0168720 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) | [X] - GB-A-N13796 (OGILVIE) | International search | [X]US4061028 ; | [Y]US4645517 ; | [Y]US3094868 |