EP0466902 - STABILIZATION OF AQUEOUS PEROXYGEN SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED STATES BORAX & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 3075 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles California 90010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states UNITED STATES BORAX & CHEMICAL CORPORATION 3075 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODS, William, G. 2922 Las Flores Riverside, CA 92503 / US | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1992/04] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91904097.2 | 17.01.1991 | [1992/04] | WO1991US00369 | Priority number, date | US19900473508 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: US 473508 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111388 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0466902 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/037, C01B15/12, C01B15/10, C01B15/00, C11D3/39 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
C01B15/106 (EP,US);
C01B15/037 (EP,US);
C01B15/123 (EP,US);
C11D3/394 (EP,US);
C11D3/3947 (EP,US);
D06L4/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/04] | C01B15/037 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/04] | Title | German: | ABGABESYSTEM MIT VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR STEUERUNG DES INTERNEN DRUCKS | [1992/04] | English: | STABILIZATION OF AQUEOUS PEROXYGEN SOLUTIONS | [1992/04] | French: | STABILISATION DE SOLUTIONS PEROXYGENEES AQUEUSES | [1992/04] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.1991 | Search fee paid | 19.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/41] | 17.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012462 (ALEXANDER AGTHE CARL, et al) | International search | [A]US3553140 (LINDNER KURT, et al); | [Y]FR2174377 (GUIHARD DONATIEN [FR]); | [Y]US3801512 (SOLENBERGER J); | [Y]US4238192 (KANDATHIL THOMAS V [US]); | [Y]US4347149 (SMITH EILEEN, et al); | [X]GB2110094 (HELLAND PER); | [Y]US4396734 (WILLIAMS EARL P, et al); | [Y]EP0104044 (CANNON EDWARDS CHARLES); | [Y]FR2557933 (SREBOT [FR]); | [Y]EP0177270 (UNIV LONDON [GB]); | [X]EP0256984 (JAQUET ORTHOPEDIE [CH]); | [X]DE3722595 (STURTZKOPF ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]DE3822742 (POLITECHNIKA SLASKA IM WINCENT [PL]); | [A]US4875973 (HEIKKILA KURT E [US], et al); | [YP]EP0385929 (JAQUET ORTHOPEDIE [CH]) |