EP0515472 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING OF PASTES AND ADHESIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mydata Automation AB Adolfsbergsvägen 11 168 66 Bromma / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states MYDATA AUTOMATION AB Karlsbodavägen 41 S-161 70 Bromma / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRIDSBERG, Lennart Bandhagsvägen 51 S-122 42 Enskede / SE | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Delhage, Einar Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Delhage, Einar Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB Box 17704 S-118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 91904157.4 | 12.02.1991 | [1992/49] | WO1991SE00094 | Priority number, date | SE19900000502 | 12.02.1990 Original published format: SE 9000502 | [1992/49] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112106 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0515472 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0515472 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/06, B23K101/42, B05C5/02, H05K3/34 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
B05C11/1034 (EP,US);
B05B12/124 (EP,US);
B05C5/0229 (EP,US);
B23K3/06 (EP,US);
H05K3/3485 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN VON PASTE UND KLEBEMITTELN | [1992/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING OF PASTES AND ADHESIVES | [1992/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION DE PATES ET D'ADHESIFS | [1992/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1991 | Translation filed | 05.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4828886 (HIEBER HARTMANN [DE]); | [A]WO9000852 (MYTRONIC AB [SE]) |