EP0470259 - LOW-CALORIE DRINKING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAICHI, Akihisa 172-3, Aza Nakajima, Takashima, naruto-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772 / JP | 02 /
HATAI, Ryuichi Otsuka Seiyaku K. K.Imagireryo, 463-10, Kagasuno Kawauchicho, Tokushima 771-01 / JP | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91904321.6 | 25.02.1991 | [1992/07] | WO1991JP00241 | Priority number, date | JP19900050414 | 28.02.1990 Original published format: JP 5041490 | [1992/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112733 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470259 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470259 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.09.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/00, A23L2/38, A23L2/26, A23L1/304 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
A23L2/60 (EP);
A23L2/00 (KR);
A23L2/68 (EP);
A23L27/36 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/07] | A23L2/00, A23L2/38 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/07] | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEZUSAMMENSTELLUNG MIT EINEM NIEDRIGEN KALORIENGEHALT | [1992/07] | English: | LOW-CALORIE DRINKING COMPOSITION | [1992/07] | French: | COMPOSITION DESALTERANTE A FAIBLE TENEUR EN CALORIES | [1992/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1991 | Translation filed | 16.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1991 | Search fee paid | 16.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55074778 ; | [A]JP52041275 ; | [Y]EP0246177 (CLARK GEORGE H); | [Y]EP0044116 (KROGER CO [US]) | [A] - WPI, FILE SUPPLIER, accession no. 80-50887C [29], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-55 074 778 (J. OGATA) 06-06-1980, & JP55074778 A 00000000 | [A] - WPI, FILE SUPPLIER, accession no. 77-33728Y [19], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-52 041 275 (AJINOMOTO K.K.) 30-03-1977, & JP52041275 A 00000000 | [A] - L. O'BRIEN NABORS et al.: "Alternative sweeteners", 1986, Marcel Dekker, Inc., New York, US | International search | [X]JPS57189672 (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD) |