EP0517746 - FABRIC CONVEYOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL SCHMALE GMBH & CO. KG Lindhorststrasse 12 D-48607 Ochtrup / DE | [1992/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREERMANN, Johannes Niedereschstr. 55 D-4434 Ochtrup / DE | 02 /
MALCHEREK, Dieter Drosselstr. 11 D-4434 Ochtrup / DE | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 D-58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91904491.7 | 22.02.1991 | [1992/51] | WO1991DE00150 | Priority number, date | DE19900002430U | 02.03.1990 Original published format: DE 9002430 U | [1992/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113016 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517746 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517746 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/02 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
B65H29/12 (EP,US);
A41H43/02 (EP,US);
B65H2701/174 (EP,US);
B65H2701/176 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | WARENFÜHRUNGSSYSTEM | [1992/51] | English: | FABRIC CONVEYOR SYSTEM | [1992/51] | French: | GUIDE-TISSU | [1992/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2133966 (COATS LTD J & P [GB]); | [X]DE3844581 (ARBTER GMBH [DE]); | [X]DE3216949 (WOLF HANS); | [A]GB659513 (STRACHAN & HENSHAW LTD, et al) |