EP0507888 - QUICK-DRYING NAIL ENAMEL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMALIA, INC. 160 East 82nd Street New York, NY 10028 / US | [1992/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPPAS, Dennis, A. 160 East 82nd Street New York, NY 10028 / US | 02 /
LARSEN, Harold, J. 592 Indian Road Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Forattini, Amelia c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91904639.1 | 10.12.1990 | [1992/42] | WO1990US07267 | Priority number, date | US19890452618 | 18.12.1989 Original published format: US 452618 | US19900614309 | 15.11.1990 Original published format: US 614309 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108731 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507888 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/04, A61K7/043 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/84 (EP,US);
A61Q3/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/594 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/42] | A61K7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/42] | Title | German: | Schnelltrocknende Nagellack Zusammensetzungen | [1992/42] | English: | QUICK-DRYING NAIL ENAMEL COMPOSITIONS | [1992/42] | French: | PREPARATIONS D'EMAILS POUR ONGLES DU TYPE A SECHAGE RAPIDE | [1992/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1992 | Search fee paid | 07.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/50] | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/50] | Request for further processing for: | 23.05.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.06.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.1994 | 31.12.1996 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0432572 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0136704 (REVLON [US]); | [Y]US3849547 (KALOPISSIS G) | International search | [X]US4421881 (BENKENDORF SOL [US], et al); | [Y]US4425326 (GUILLON MICHEL [FR], et al); | [Y]US4798720 (HOLDER WILLIAM L [US]); | [X]AU1518283 (BROWN DAVID STANLEY, et al); | [X]WO8303754 (COATES FREDERICA VAUGHAN); | [X]US4475912 (COATES FREDRICA V [US]); | [X]US3150664 (NOEL DONALD E); | [X]US2808831 (WINSLETT LUCILE B); | [X]US1669188 (CONDYLIS JESSIE C) |