EP0468038 - ABSORPTION REFRIGERATION AND HEAT PUMP SYSTEM WITH DEFROST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLUMBIA GAS SYSTEM SERVICE CORPORATION 20 Mountchanin Road Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | [1992/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTY, Stephen, E. 5263 Whitegate Court Dublin, OH 43017 / US | 02 /
COOK, F., Bert 4458 Wetmore Road, East Columbus, OH 43224 / US | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Cole, David John Executive Liaison Services 43 Mount Felix Walton-on-Thames Surrey KT12 2PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Cole, David John Executive Liaison Services 54 Templemere Weybridge Surrey KT13 9PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91904740.7 | 06.02.1991 | [1992/05] | WO1991US00812 | Priority number, date | US19900478274 | 09.02.1990 Original published format: US 478274 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112470 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0468038 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0468038 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F25B15/00, F25B27/00, F25B29/00 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
C09K5/047 (EP,US);
F24H1/403 (EP,US);
F24H4/02 (EP,US);
F25B15/008 (EP,US);
F25B29/006 (EP,US);
F25B33/00 (EP,US);
F25B47/027 (EP,US);
Y02A30/27 (EP,US);
Y02B30/62 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/05] | F25B15/00, F25B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | ABSORPTIONSKÜHL- UND WÄRMEPUMPENANLAGE MIT ENTEISUNG | [1998/15] | English: | ABSORPTION REFRIGERATION AND HEAT PUMP SYSTEM WITH DEFROST | [1992/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE REFRIGERATION PAR ABSORPTION ET DE POMPE A CHALEUR A DEGIVRAGE | [1992/05] |
Former [1992/05] | ABSORPTIONSKÜHLUNGS- UND WÄRMEPUMPENANLAGE MIT ENTFROSTER | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1991 | Search fee paid | 24.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Request for further processing for: | 26.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.1998 | BE | 08.04.1998 | CH | 08.04.1998 | ES | 08.04.1998 | GR | 08.04.1998 | LI | 08.04.1998 | NL | 08.04.1998 | DK | 08.07.1998 | SE | 08.07.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
BE | 08.04.1998 | ||
CH | 08.04.1998 | ||
ES | 08.04.1998 | ||
GR | 08.04.1998 | ||
LI | 08.04.1998 | ||
NL | 08.04.1998 | ||
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
BE | 08.04.1998 | ||
CH | 08.04.1998 | ||
ES | 08.04.1998 | ||
GR | 08.04.1998 | ||
LI | 08.04.1998 | ||
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
BE | 08.04.1998 | ||
CH | 08.04.1998 | ||
GR | 08.04.1998 | ||
LI | 08.04.1998 | ||
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [2000/17] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
BE | 08.04.1998 | ||
CH | 08.04.1998 | ||
LI | 08.04.1998 | ||
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
BE | 08.04.1998 | ||
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 08.04.1998 | |
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 08.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2212869 (TORNQUIST EARL L); | [A]US3137144 (KAUFMAN JOHN E, et al) [A] 1,12,13,15 * column 1, line 61 - column 4, line 13; figure . *; | [A]US3527060 (KRUGGEL ROY W) [A] 1-3,8,12,15 * column 2, line 23 - column 12, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4408468 (ALEFELD GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]US4411140 (KATSUMATA NAOTO [JP], et al); | [A]US4542628 (SARKISIAN PAUL H [US], et al) [A] 1,12,15 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 42; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US4548046 (BRANDON BERNARD [FR], et al) | International search | [A]US4464907 (MACK ROBERT [DE], et al); | [A]US4719767 (REID JR EDWARD A [US], et al) |