EP0514483 - MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXFORD INSTRUMENTS LIMITED Eynsham Oxford, OX8 1BP / GB | [1992/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDOUGALL, Ian Leitch 16 Lees Heights Charlbury, Oxon OX8 3EL / GB | 02 /
HANLEY, Peter Western Lodge Forest of Dean, Gloucestershire GL15 4JQ / GB | 03 /
HAWKES, Robert, Carter Derrymore House Dry Dayton, Cambridge CB3 8BU / GB | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91904868.6 | 07.02.1991 | [1992/48] | WO1991GB00194 | Priority number, date | GB19900002863 | 08.02.1990 Original published format: GB 9002863 | [1992/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112538 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514483 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514483 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/38 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
G01R33/3808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN VON MAGNETFELDERN | [1992/48] | English: | MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATING ASSEMBLY | [1992/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE GENERATION DE CHAMP MAGNETIQUE | [1992/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 28.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 20.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 12.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.07.1997 | NL | 23.07.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 23.07.1997 | |
FR | 19.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | FR | 19.12.1997 | Cited in | International search | US4721914 [ ] (FUKUSHIMA EIICHI [US], et al); | EP0160350 [ ] (OXFORD MAGNET TECH [GB]); | EP0399789 [ ] (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | EP0186998 [ ] (OXFORD MAGNET TECH [GB]); | GB2052069 [ ] (INSTRUMENTARIUM OY); | GB2070254 [ ] (OXFORD INSTR GROUP LTD); | US4656423 [ ] (SUGIMOTO HIROSHI [JP]) | Examination | US4701736 |