EP0516716 - THERMOPLASTIC CUSTOM DENTAL TRAY HAVING HIGH MODULUS WARM STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OXMAN, Joel, D. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133 / US | 02 /
UBEL, F., Andrew, III Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133 / US | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Mossmark, Anders Lennart, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Mossmark, Anders, et al Albihn West AB, Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 91905141.7 | 25.02.1991 | [1992/50] | WO1991US01270 | Priority number, date | US19900484106 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: US 484106 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112777 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516716 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516716 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61C9/00 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
A61C9/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1992/50] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHER ABDRUCKLÖFFEL FÜR DIE ZAHNBEHANDLUNG MIT HOHEM ELASTIZITÄTSMODUL IN ERWÄRMTEN ZUSTAND | [1992/50] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC CUSTOM DENTAL TRAY HAVING HIGH MODULUS WARM STATE | [1992/50] | French: | PORTE-EMPREINTES DENTAIRE THERMOPLASTIQUE ADAPTABLE AYANT UN MODULE D'ETAT DE CHALEUR ELEVE | [1992/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | WO9014052 [ ]; | US4361528 [ ] |