EP0471856 - 15-DEOXYPROSTAGLANDIN DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states SHIONOGI & CO., LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHI, Morio, 31-26, Katagihara-takodencho Nishiky0-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Kimio, 1-115, Furukawa-cho 3-chome Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 663 / JP | 03 /
KAWADA, Kenji, C22-107, 3-1, Shinsenrinishi-machi Toyonaka-shi Osaka 565 / JP | 04 /
GOH, Yasumasa, 5-8, Yayoigaoka 4-chome Sanda-shi Hyogo 669-13 / JP | [1992/09] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91905484.1 | 07.03.1991 | [1992/09] | WO1991JP00305 | Priority number, date | JP19900057476 | 08.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5747690 | [1992/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113869 | Date: | 19.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471856 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471856 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C405/00, A61K31/557 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
C07C405/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/557 (KR);
A61P27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/09] | Title | German: | 15-DEOXYPROSTAGLANDINDERIVAT | [1992/09] | English: | 15-DEOXYPROSTAGLANDIN DERIVATIVE | [1992/09] | French: | DERIVE DE 15-DESOXYPROSTAGLANDINE | [1992/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1991 | Translation filed | 06.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1991 | Search fee paid | 06.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2193613 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | [X]EP0097023 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) | [A] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, no. 50, 1975, pages 4481-4482, Pergamon Press, GB; A. HAMON et al.: "Synthesis of prostanoic acid" | [XD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, no. 25, abstract no. 194421c, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.R. GORMAN et al.: "Inhibition of human platelet thromboxane synthetase by 9,11-azoprosta-5,13-dienoic acid", & PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., 74(9), 4007-11 | International search | DE2337581 [ ] (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | US3847962 [ ] (PATTERSON J, et al); | US3872139 [ ] (PATTERSON JOHN W, et al); | JPS5032151 [ ]; | JPS5037753 [ ]; | JPS591418 [ ] (UNIV COLUMBIA); | JPS6147459 [ ] (SYNTEX INC); | JPS6366122 [ ] (UNIV COLUMBIA); | JPH02108 [ ] (UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUJO KK [JP]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 64, No. 11, May 23, 1966 (23. 05. 66), Upjohn Co., "Microbiological conversions of unsaturated fatty acids" Refer to Abstract No. 16587f, Belg. 659, 984, Aug. 19, 1965. | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 64, No. 6, March 14, 1966 (14. 03. 66), Upjohn Co., "Microbiological conversion of unsaturated fatty acids" Refer to Abstract No. 8899d, Belg. 659, 983, Aug. 19, 1965. | Examination | JPS5032151 | JPS5037753 | JPS591418 | JPS6147459 | JPS6366122 | JPH022108 |