EP0518934 - THREAD TENSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IRO AB Vistaholm P.O. Box 54 523 01 Ulricehamn / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states IRO AB Vistaholm P.O. Box 54 S-523 01 Ulricehamn / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSSON, Kurt, Arne, Gunnar Stenasgatan 11 S-523 00 Ulricehamn / SE | [1992/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91905550.9 | 06.03.1991 | [1992/52] | WO1991EP00414 | Priority number, date | SE19900000808 | 06.03.1990 Original published format: SE 9000808 | [1992/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9114031 | Date: | 19.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518934 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518934 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/34, B65H59/00, B65H57/22 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
D03D47/34 (EP,KR,US);
B65H57/00 (EP,US);
B65H57/28 (EP,US);
B65H59/225 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/52] | Title | German: | FADENBREMSVORRICHTUNG | [1992/52] | English: | THREAD TENSION DEVICE | [1992/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TENSION DE FIL | [1992/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 11.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 29.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH503652 (MEYER FA GEB [DE]); | [A]DE2359550 (DU PONT); | [A]GB2027456 (MEMMINGER GMBH) |