EP0521010 - PRUNING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOLEHMAINEN, Tenho Haavikkotie 4 SF-83330 Kaatamo / FI | [1993/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Siebmanns, Hubertus Gotapatent AB, Box 154 561 22 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Siebmanns, Hubertus Gotapatent AB, Box 154 S-561 22 Huskvarna / SE | Application number, filing date | 91905551.7 | 14.03.1991 | [1993/01] | WO1991FI00073 | Priority number, date | FI19900001311 | 16.03.1990 Original published format: FI 901311 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113736 | Date: | 19.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521010 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521010 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B27L1/06, A01G3/08 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B27B9/02 (EP,US);
A01G3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | ÄSTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1993/01] | English: | PRUNING DEVICE | [1993/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ELAGAGE | [1993/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 15.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.1994 | BE | 30.11.1994 | CH | 30.11.1994 | DK | 30.11.1994 | GR | 30.11.1994 | IT | 30.11.1994 | LI | 30.11.1994 | NL | 30.11.1994 | GB | 14.03.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
DK | 30.11.1994 | ||
GR | 30.11.1994 | ||
IT | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
GB | 14.03.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
DK | 30.11.1994 | ||
IT | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
GB | 14.03.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
DK | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
GB | 14.03.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
GB | 14.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 30.11.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3373489 (ROY GILES ALONZO); | [A]DE1944204 (GRONEMANN FLORENZ); | [A]SE366200 (ENGMAN N, et al); | [A]FR2539269 (HAZARD ROBERT [FR]); | [A]EP0117848 (YAMADA MACHINERY IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]SE438977 (NILSSON GORAN ALFRED) |