EP0554247 - NEUROPROTECTIVE INDOLONE AND RELATED DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENARD, Bertrand, Leo 7 Whaling Drive Waterford, New London County, CT 06385 / US | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1998/12] | Ruddock, Keith Stephen, et al Pfizer Limited, European Patent Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/32] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91905608.5 | 04.03.1991 | [1993/32] | WO1991US01470 | Priority number, date | US19900522332 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: US 522332 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117156 | Date: | 14.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554247 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554247 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D413/06, C07D417/06, C07D419/06, C07D471/08, A61K31/445, A61K31/47, A61K31/40, A61K31/42, A61K31/425 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
C07D451/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D451/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/32] | Title | German: | NEUROPROTECTIVE INDOLONE UND VERWANDTE DERIVATE | [1993/32] | English: | NEUROPROTECTIVE INDOLONE AND RELATED DERIVATIVES | [1993/32] | French: | INDOLONE NEUROPROTECTEUR ET DERIVES APPARENTES | [1993/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3509164 (CARRON MAURICE CLAUDE ERNEST, et al); | [A]FR2546166 (SYNTHELABO [FR]); | [X]EP0351282 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) | [X] - Chemical Abstracts, Volume 86,no. 25, issued 1977, June 20 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), Nakagawa, Kazuyuki et al. "Carbostyril derivativ | [X] - Chemical Abstracts, Volume 113, no. 21, issued 1990 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), J.P. Poute "Aminoketone and amino alcoholderivatives". | Examination | GB2071094 | JPS57142972 | EP0109317 | EP0288563 | EP0398578 |