EP0515567 - DIFFRACTIVE OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLO-OR LTD. Kiryat Weizmann Rehovot 76100 / IL | For all designated states Coherent, Inc. 3210 Porter Drive Palo Alto California 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states HOLO-OR LTD. Kiryat Weizmann Rehovot 76100 / IL | ||
For all designated states Coherent, Inc. 3210 Porter Drive Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSINGER, Israel 19 Yakov Street 76 100 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
KEDMI, Yossi 11 Hagalil Street 76 100 Rehovot / IL | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | Jackson, David Spence, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91905722.4 | 11.02.1991 | [1992/49] | WO1991US00947 | Priority number, date | US19900479474 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: US 479474 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112543 | Date: | 22.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0515567 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18 | [1993/07] | CPC: |
G02B5/1876 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/49] | G02B5/18, G02B27/44 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/49] | Title | German: | BEUGUNGSOPTISCHES ELEMENT | [1992/49] | English: | DIFFRACTIVE OPTICAL ELEMENT | [1992/49] | French: | ELEMENT OPTIQUE DIFFRACTIF | [1992/49] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1992 | Search fee paid | 27.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/33] | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0441206 | International search | [X]JPH10142604 ; | [X]US4895790 ; | [A]US4846552 | [X] - Optics Communications, Vol. 5, No. 4, July 1972, D'AURIA et al, "Photolithographic Fabrication of Thin Film Lenses", pages 232 to 235. See entire document. | [X] - Optical Engineering, Vol. 28, No. 6, June 1989 (SWANSON et al.) "Diffractive Optical Elements for use in Infrared Systems", pages 605-608. See entire document. |