EP0519964 - APPARATUS OF TREATING PIGMENTED LESIONS USING PULSED IRRADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/01] | APPARATUS AND METHOD OF TREATING PIGMENTED LESIONS USING PULSED IRRADIATION | ||
[1994/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANDELA LASER CORPORATION 530 Boston Post Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | For all designated states Trustees of Boston University 147 Bay State Road Boston, MA 02215 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states CANDELA LASER CORPORATION 530 Boston Post Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | ||
For all designated states TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY 147 Bay State Road Boston, MA 02215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Oon, Tian 1 Marlborough Street Boston, MA 02116 / US | 02 /
HSIA, James, C. 7 Apache Avenue Andover, MA 01810 / US | 03 /
FURUMOTO, Horace 14 Woodridge Road Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91905725.7 | 14.03.1991 | [1993/01] | WO1991US01715 | Priority number, date | US19900493309 | 14.03.1990 Original published format: US 493309 | [1993/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113653 | Date: | 19.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0519964 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0519964 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP,US);
A61N5/067 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PIGMENTIERTEN LÄSIONEN DURCH GEPULSTE STRAHLUNGEN | [1994/32] | English: | APPARATUS OF TREATING PIGMENTED LESIONS USING PULSED IRRADIATION | [1994/32] | French: | APPAREIL UTILISES POUR SOIGNER LES LESIONS PIGMENTEES A L'AIDE DE RAYONNEMENTS PULSES | [1994/32] |
Former [1993/01] | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PIGMENTIERTEN LÄSIONEN DURCH GEPULSTE STRAHLUNGEN | ||
Former [1993/01] | APPARATUS AND METHOD OF TREATING PIGMENTED LESIONS USING PULSED IRRADIATION | ||
Former [1993/01] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE UTILISES POUR SOIGNER LES LESIONS PIGMENTEES A L'AIDE DE RAYONNEMENTS PULSES | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.08.1994 | IT | 10.08.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 10.08.1994 | Cited in | International search | EP0172490 [ ] (MEDICAL LASER RESEARCH AND DEV [US]) | [X] - Lasers in Surgery and Medicine, volume 1, 1981, R.R. Anderson et al.: "Microvasculature can be selectively damaged using dye lasers: A basic theory and experimental evidence in human skin" pages 263-276 |