EP0517816 - NON-VOLATILE MEMORY STORAGE OF WRITE OPERATION IDENTIFIER IN DATA STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICRO TECHNOLOGY, INC. 5065 E. Hunter Avenue Anaheim California 92807 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states MICRO TECHNOLOGY, INC. 5065 E. Hunter Avenue Anaheim, California 92807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATZ, Randy, H. 65 Eucalyptus Road Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | 02 /
POWERS, David, T. 2265 Bayo Claros Circle Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 03 /
JAFFE, David, H. 551 South Road Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 04 /
GLIDER, Joseph, S. 3292 Murray Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 05 /
IDLEMAN, Thomas, E. 2660 Brady Court Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91905761.2 | 27.02.1991 | [1992/51] | WO1991US01254 | Priority number, date | US19900487648 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: US 487648 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9113405 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517816 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14, G06F11/08, G06F11/00, G11B20/18 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
G06F11/1076 (EP,US);
G06F11/08 (EP,US);
G06F11/1441 (EP,US);
G06F11/1443 (EP,US);
G06F2201/835 (EP,US);
G06F2211/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/51] | Title | German: | NICHTFLÜCHTIGE SPEICHERUNG DES ERKENNUNGSZEICHENS EINER SCHREIBOPERATION IN EINER DATENSPEICHEREINRICHTUNG | [1992/51] | English: | NON-VOLATILE MEMORY STORAGE OF WRITE OPERATION IDENTIFIER IN DATA STORAGE DEVICE | [1992/51] | French: | MEMOIRE REMANENTE D'IDENTIFICATEUR D'OPERATION D'ECRITURE DANS UN SYSTEME DE STOCKAGE DE DONNEES | [1992/51] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 28.06.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0249091 (IBM [US]); | [A]WO8910594 (AMDAHL CORP [US]); | [A]WO8809968 (CAB TEK INC [US]); | [A]GB1545169 (BURROUGHS CORP) | [A] - FTCS 17 DIGEST OF PAPERS July 6, 1987, PITTSBURGH, PENNSYLVANIA, USA pages 176 - 181; Y.DISHON ET AL.: 'A HIGHLY AVAILABLE STORAGE SYSTEM USING THE CHECKSUM METHOD ' see page 178, right column, line 6 - page 179, left column, line 12 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 15, no. 9, February 1973, pages 2813 - 2816; V.J. KRUSKAL: 'DETECTING DISCREPANT SEGMENTS IN A PAGING ENVIRONMENT ' see the whole document |