Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] |
17.02.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] |
25.01.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] |
25.01.1995 | Change - representative | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] |
22.01.1993 | First examination report | |
18.12.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] |
18.12.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] |