EP0516747 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING INFECTIONS CAUSED BY ORGANISMS SENSITIVE TO $g(b)-LACTAM ANTIBIOTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.06.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 23.07.1997 [1997/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARVEAU, Richard, P. 12914 N.E. 111th Place Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
BLAKE, James, J. 201 Galer Street, 243 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | 03 /
COSAND, Wesley, L. 9022 N.E. 152nd Street Bothell, WA 98011 / US | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91905923.8 | 25.02.1991 | [1992/50] | WO1991US01224 | Priority number, date | US19900484020 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: US 484020 | US19910655321 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: US 655321 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112815 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516747 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.09.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/02, C07K7/00, C07K7/10 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K38/1703 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K14/435 (EP,US);
C07K14/522 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/1703, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1992/50] | A61K37/02, C07K7/00, C07K7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/50] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFEKTIONEN DURCH FÜR BETA-LACTAM-ANTIBIOTIKA EMPFINDLICHEN ORGANISMEN | [1992/50] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING INFECTIONS CAUSED BY ORGANISMS SENSITIVE TO $g(b)-LACTAM ANTIBIOTICS | [1992/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES POUR TRAITER DES INFECTIONS CAUSEES PAR DES ORGANISMES SENSIBLES AUX ANTIBIOTIQUES $g(b)-LACTAME | [1992/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1992 | Search fee paid | 19.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/30] | 27.02.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO9012587 (MAGAININ SCIENCES INC [US]) | International search | US4107298 [ ] (LUNING BJORN ERIK GUSTAV BERTI); | US4543252 [ ] (LEHRER ROBERT I [US], et al); | US4659692 [ ] (LEHRER ROBERT I [US], et al); | US4810777 [ ] (ZASLOFF MICHAEL A [US]) | [ ] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, Vol. 85, issued July 1988, CHRISTENSEN et al.: "Channel-forming properties of cecropins and related model compounds incorporated into planar lipid membranes", pages 5072-5076, see Abstract. | [ ] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, Vol. 85, issued February 1988, ZASLOFF et al.: "Antimicrobial activity of synthetic magainin peptides and several analogues", pages 910-913, see the Abstract. |