EP0476145 - DEVICE FOR LOADING WITH CASSETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHARA, Mitsuru 572-388, Magechi Kumagaya-shi, Saitama-ken 360 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Yuji 3642-38, Higashikata Fukaya-shi, Saitama-ken 366 / JP | 03 /
KOBA, Akinobu Toshiba Kazoku Apartment A206, 77-3, Tokiwacho Fukaya-shi, Saitama-ken 366 / JP | 04 /
SUDA, Kenichi 7-15-9, Kamishibachonishi Fukaya-shi, Saitama-ken 366 / JP | 05 /
SATOMI, Takeshi 289-1, Niibori Kumagaya-shi, Saitama-ken 360 / JP | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91906546.6 | 29.03.1991 | [1992/13] | WO1991JP00419 | Priority number, date | JP19900081108 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8110890 | JP19900082961 | 31.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8296190 | [1992/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115850 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476145 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476145 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/675 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
G11B25/066 (EP,US);
G11B15/675 (KR);
G11B15/67539 (EP,US);
G11B15/67549 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/13] | Title | German: | KASSETTENLADEVORRICHTUNG | [1996/47] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOADING WITH CASSETTE | [1992/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT DE CASSETTE | [1992/13] |
Former [1992/13] | Kassettenladevorrichtung | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1991 | Translation filed | 23.12.1991 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1991 | Search fee paid | 23.12.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0317370 (GOLD STAR CO [KR]); | [X]EP0341762 (SONY CORP [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPS6338438Y ; | [Y]JPH01133252 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) |