EP0476146 - DEVICE FOR LOADING CASSETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOKA, Satoshi 483-10-1D, Uwanodai Fukaya-shi, Saitama-ken 366 / JP | 02 /
KAWAKAMI, Hiroshi 76-2, Tokiwacho Fukaya-shi, Saitama-ken 366 / JP | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91906549.0 | 29.03.1991 | [1992/13] | WO1991JP00416 | Priority number, date | JP19900082952 | 31.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8295290 | [1992/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115847 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476146 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476146 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/675 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
G11B15/17 (EP,US);
G11B15/675 (EP,KR,US);
G11B15/67536 (EP,US);
G11B15/67549 (EP,US);
G11B25/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/13] | Title | German: | KASSETTENLADEVORRICHTUNG | [1992/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOADING CASSETTE | [1992/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN PLACE D'UNE CASSETTE | [1992/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1991 | Translation filed | 23.12.1991 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1991 | Search fee paid | 23.12.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60151865 ; | [A]EP0311390 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 327 (P-415) 21 December 1985 & JP-A-60 151 865 (MATSUSHITA) 9 August 1985, & JP60151865 A 19850809 | International search | [Y]JPH0135319Y ; | [Y]JPS62204463 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS5945659 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |