EP0524214 - PROCESS FOR MEASURING THE DIFFUSION AND PERMEATION COEFFICIENT OF A GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAM, Gottfried Grasweg 18 D-5206 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid 1 / DE | [1993/04] | Application number, filing date | 91907132.4 | 11.04.1991 | [1993/04] | WO1991DE00304 | Priority number, date | DE19904011731 | 11.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4011731 | [1993/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115748 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524214 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524214 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/08 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
G01N13/00 (EP);
G01N15/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DES DIFFUSIONS- UND PERMEATIONSKOEFFIZIENTEN EINES GASES | [1993/04] | English: | PROCESS FOR MEASURING THE DIFFUSION AND PERMEATION COEFFICIENT OF A GAS | [1993/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE DU COEFFICIENT DE DIFFUSION ET DE PERMEATION D'UN GAZ | [1993/04] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.03.1996 | IT | 20.03.1996 | AT | 11.04.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
IT | 20.03.1996 | ||
AT | 11.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/42] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
AT | 11.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 20.03.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2556217 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH); | [X]US4389878 (MANZIE JR OTTER L); | [A]GB2197080 (CITY TECH) |