EP0531527 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PLASMA-DETONATION WORKING OF METAL ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT ELEKTROSVARKI IMENI E.O.PATONA AKADEMII NAUK UKRAINSKOI SSR ul. Bozhenko, 11 Kiev, 252150 / UA | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states INSTITUT ELEKTROSVARKI IMENI E.O.PATONA AKADEMII NAUK UKRAINSKOI SSR ul. Bozhenko, 11 Kiev, 252150 / SU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUSCHENKO, Konstantin Andreevich ul. Komandarma Kameneva, 4a-115 Kiev, 252195 / SU | 02 /
TJURIN, Jury Nikolaevich ul. Podlesnaya, 2-85 Kiev, 252164 / SU | 03 /
ASTAKHOV, Evgeny Arkadievich ul. Podlesnaya, 2-164 Kiev, 252164 / SU | 04 /
BORISOV, Jury Sergeevich ul. Draizera, 9-23 Kiev, 252222 / SU | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Ebbinghaus, Dieter v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Ebbinghaus, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | Ebbinghaus, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91907287.6 | 27.03.1991 | [1993/11] | WO1991SU00051 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217619 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531527 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531527 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 15.10.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, C23C4/00, B05B7/00, B05B7/20 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
B05B7/0006 (EP);
C23C4/126 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/11] | C23C4/00, B05B7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON METALLPRODUKTEN DURCH PLASMA-DETONATION | [1993/11] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PLASMA-DETONATION WORKING OF METAL ARTICLES | [1993/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR USINER PAR DETONATION AU PLASMA DES ARTICLES METALLIQUES | [1993/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1992 | Translation filed | 23.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1992 | Search fee paid | 23.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 08.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.1996 | 31.03.1997 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.1998 | BE | 14.01.1998 | CH | 14.01.1998 | ES | 14.01.1998 | FR | 14.01.1998 | GR | 14.01.1998 | IT | 14.01.1998 | LI | 14.01.1998 | NL | 14.01.1998 | LU | 27.03.1998 | DK | 14.04.1998 | GB | 14.04.1998 | SE | 14.04.1998 | DE | 15.04.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/35] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
ES | 14.01.1998 | ||
FR | 14.01.1998 | ||
GR | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
NL | 14.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
DK | 14.04.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
ES | 14.01.1998 | ||
GR | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
NL | 14.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
DK | 14.04.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
ES | 14.01.1998 | ||
GR | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
NL | 14.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
ES | 14.01.1998 | ||
GR | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
CH | 14.01.1998 | ||
GR | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LI | 14.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
GR | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 20.04.1998 | ||
LI | 20.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
GR | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.03.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
IT | 14.01.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
GB | 14.04.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/49] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
BE | 14.01.1998 | ||
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
FR | 12.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
SE | 14.04.1998 | ||
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/41] | AT | 14.01.1998 | |
DE | 15.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 14.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2905728 (D.A. DUDKO; A.I. ZVEREV; E.A. ASTACHOV) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2159540 (WEDTECH CORP.) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1935123 (NIPPON TUNGSTEN CO. LTD.) [A] 1-3 * page 5 - page 10; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0401372 (NOVOSIBIRSKY GOSUDARSTVENNY UNIVERSITET IMENI LENINSKOGO KOMSOMOLA) [A] 4-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]SU747010 (NII TEKH AVTOMOBIL PROMY [SU]); | [A]US4172558 ; | [A]DE3903888 ; | [A]EP0297845 | [A] - JU.S. BORISOV et al. "Gazotermicheskie pokrytia iz poroshkovykh materialov", spravochnik, 1987, Naukova Dumka, (Kiev), pages 76-78. |