EP0522036 - BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS cryIIIC GENE AND PROTEIN TOXIC TO COLEOPTERAN INSECTS. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/02] | $i(BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS cryIIIC) GENE AND PROTEIN TOXIC TO COLEOPTERAN INSECTS | ||
[1995/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167 / US | ||
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states ECOGEN INC 2005 Cabot Boulevard West Langhorne, PA 19047-1810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONOVAN, William, P. 36 Calicobush Road Levittown, PA 19057 / US | 02 /
RUPAR, Mark, J. 2225-C Prior Road Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | 03 /
SLANEY, Annette, C. 4 Dunmoor Court South Hamilton Square, NJ 08690 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Timothy, B. 142 E. Highland Avenue Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91907293.4 | 18.03.1991 | [1993/02] | WO1991US01786 | Priority number, date | US19900496568 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: US 496568 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9114778 | Date: | 03.10.1991 | [1991/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522036 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522036 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/32, A01N63/02 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
C07K14/325 (EP,KR,US);
A01N63/23 (KR);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
Y10S530/82 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/50, A01N63/23, A01N2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/02] | Title | German: | BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS-CRYIIIC-GEN UND FÜR COLEOPTERA-INSEKTEN TOXISCHES PROTEIN | [1993/02] | English: | BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS cryIIIC GENE AND PROTEIN TOXIC TO COLEOPTERAN INSECTS. | [1995/30] | French: | GENE cryIIIC PROVENANT DU BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS ET PROTEINE TOXIQUE POUR LES INSCETES COLEOPTERES. | [1995/30] |
Former [1993/02] | $i(BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS cryIIIC) GENE AND PROTEIN TOXIC TO COLEOPTERAN INSECTS | ||
Former [1993/02] | GENE $i(cryIIIC) PROVENANT DU $i(BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS) ET PROTEINE TOXIQUE POUR LES INSECTES COLEOPTERES | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/30: Teilanmeldung 94102819.3 eingereicht am 18/03/91 | EPB 1995/30: Divisional application 94102819.3 filed on 18/03/91 | EPB 1995/30: Demande divisionnaire 94102819.3 déposée le 18/03/91 | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94102819.3 / EP0606110 | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.07.1995 | DK | 26.07.1995 | GR | 26.07.1995 | LI | 26.07.1995 | SE | 26.10.1995 | LU | 31.03.1996 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | CH | 26.07.1995 | |
DK | 26.07.1995 | ||
LI | 26.07.1995 | ||
SE | 26.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/18] | CH | 26.07.1995 | |
LI | 26.07.1995 | ||
SE | 26.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 26.10.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0288829 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]WO8808880 (ECOGEN INC [US]); | [A]EP0337604 (MYCOGEN CORP [US]) | [A] - Nucleic Acids Research, volume 18, no. 5, 11 March 1990, IRL Press, A. Sick et al.: "Nucleotide sequence of a coleopteran-active toxin gene from a new isolate of Bacillus thuringiensis subsp. tolworthi", page 1305, see the whole page |