EP0524992 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR OPERATING A SHIP'S MOTIVE INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft D-88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURER, Gerhard Ailingerstrasse 75 D-7990 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
BRAIG, Manfred Freschenstrasse 1 D-7990 Friedrichshafen 1 / DE | 03 /
AUER, Raimund Marienstrasse 57 D-7991 Eriskirch / DE | 04 /
GOEBEL, Christoph Meersburger Strasse 1 D-7997 Immenstaad / DE | 05 /
SCHWARZ, Josef Alpenstrasse 28 D-7990 Friedrichshafen / DE | 06 /
VOSS, Thomas St. Hubertstrasse 11 D-7992 Tettnang / DE | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1996/13] |
Former [1993/05] | Raue, Reimund, et al ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG D-88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91907418.7 | 12.04.1991 | [1993/05] | WO1991EP00702 | Priority number, date | DE19904012107 | 14.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4012107 | [1993/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9116235 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524992 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524992 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B63H21/22 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B63H21/213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1993/05] | Title | German: | STEUERSYSTEM ZUM BETREIBEN EINER ANTRIEBSANLAGE EINES SCHIFFES | [1993/05] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR OPERATING A SHIP'S MOTIVE INSTALLATION | [1993/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE L'INSTALLATION D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN BATEAU | [1993/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/25] | Request for further processing for: | 22.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2925156 (GRANT ARTHUR F, et al); | [A]DE1276491 (BURMEISTER & WAINS MOT MASK); | [X]US3653476 (ALLEN CLIFFORD W, et al); | [Y]FR2231563 (BRUNSWICK CORP [US]); | [A]US4253349 (FLOETER LARRY A, et al); | [A]US4558769 (NEISEN GERALD F [US]); | [A]GB2194862 (HELVAR OY); | [A]WO8808390 (STYR KONTROLL TEKNIK I AB [SE]); | [Y]DE3907841 (TWIN DISC INC [US]) | [A] - Marine Engineer and Naval Architect, Band 95, Nr. 1154, Mai 1972, "BBC bridge control for propulsion turbines", Seiten 157-159, siehe Seite 157 |