EP0525020 - BROADCAST DIGITAL SOUND PROCESSING SYSTEM WITH TIME COMPANDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPUTER CONCEPTS CORPORATION 8375 Melrose Lenexa, KS 66214 / US | [1993/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, Gregory, L. 11700 W. 102nd Terrace Overland Park, KS 66214 / US | 02 /
ELLIOTT, Gordon, L. 504 E. 108th Terrace Kansas City, MO 64131 / US | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91907693.5 | 29.03.1991 | [1993/05] | WO1991US02199 | Priority number, date | US19900503444 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: US 503444 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115845 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525020 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/00, G06F3/16 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/16 (EP,US);
G11B20/00007 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04H60/07 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10592 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/05] | G10L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR RUNDFUNKDIGITALTONVERARBEITUNG MIT ZEITKOMPANDIERUNG | [1993/05] | English: | BROADCAST DIGITAL SOUND PROCESSING SYSTEM WITH TIME COMPANDING | [1993/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE LA RADIODIFFUSION SONORE NUMERIQUE A COMPRESSION-EXTENSION TEMPORELLE | [1993/05] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1992 | Search fee paid | 30.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/23] | 15.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8809540 (DUBRUCQ DENYSE [US]) [X] 1-3,11,26-29,32,35,36,41 * figures 1-3,13A * * page 4, line 11 - page 7, line 2 * * page 14, line 25 - line 29 * * page 45, line 11 - line 23 * | [X] - P.JAKATDAR ET AL.,, "SPEECH COMMUNICATION FOR PERSONAL COMPUTERS", ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION, BRUSSELS BE, (19860101), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 79 - 86, XP001197049 [X] 1,2,26,27,29 * page 85, column R, line 35 - line 55 * | International search | [Y]US4665514 (CHING YAU-CHAU [US], et al); | [Y]US4723285 (LE ROY GUY [FR], et al); | [Y]US4864620 (BIALICK LEONID [IL]) |