EP0562111 - STANDOFF CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLASMA CUTTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHI, Yozo, c/o Komatsu Research Laboratory 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | 02 /
NOZAKI, Eiichi, c/o Komatsu Research Laboratory 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | 03 /
HASEGAWA, Masahiko, c/o Komatsu Research Lab. 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | 04 /
KUROKAWA, Iwao, c/o Komatsu Research Laboratory 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | 05 /
WAKUI, Atsushi, c/o Komatsu Research Laboratory 1200, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 91907711.5 | 17.04.1991 | [1993/39] | WO1991JP00514 | Priority number, date | JP19900102329 | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10232990 | JP19900102330 | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10233090 | JP19900102656 | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10265690 | JP19900102657 | 17.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10265790 | [1993/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9116170 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562111 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562111 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23K10/00, B23K9/12 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
B23K10/006 (EP);
B23K10/02 (EP);
B23K9/126 (EP);
H05H1/3494 (EP);
H05H1/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/39] | Title | German: | ABSTANDSTEUERVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG EINER PLASMASCHNEIDMASCHINE | [1993/39] | English: | STANDOFF CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLASMA CUTTING MACHINE | [1993/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE L'ECART POUR MACHINE DE DECOUPAGE PAR FUSION PLASMA | [1993/39] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/40: (deleted) | EPB 1997/40: (deleted) | EPB 1997/40: (deleted) | EPB 1997/25: Teilanmeldung 97250094.6 eingereicht am 24/03/97 | EPB 1997/25: Divisional application 97250094.6 filed on 24/03/97 | EPB 1997/25: Demande divisionnaire 97250094.6 déposée le 24/03/97 | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1992 | Translation filed | 16.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1992 | Search fee paid | 16.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97250094.6 / EP0795372 | EP97250095.3 / EP0795373 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.10.1997 | GB | 17.04.1998 | [2002/32] |
Former [1999/25] | GB | 17.04.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1048674 ; | [X]EP0167390 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 237 (M-833)5 June 1989 & JP-A-10 48 674 ( NKK CORP. ) 23 February 1989, & JP1048674 A 19890223 | International search | [A]JPS57195582 (HITACHI SEIKO KK); | [A]JPS5744469 (SANSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPS62127173 (TANAKA SEISAKUSHO KK) |