EP0575318 - AN ELECTRONIC MEASUREMENT APPARATUS MOVABLE IN A CASED BOREHOLE AND COMPENSATING FOR CASING RESISTANCE DIFFERENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARAMAGNETIC LOGGING, INC. 18730 - 142nd Avenue, N.E. Woodinville Washington 98072 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states PARAMAGNETIC LOGGING, INC. 18730 - 142nd Avenue, N.E. Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAIL, William, Banning, III 3123 198th Place S.E. Bothell, WA 98012 / US | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1995/18] |
Former [1993/52] | Targett, Kenneth Stanley D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91907875.8 | 14.03.1991 | [1993/52] | WO1991US01707 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216859 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575318 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575318 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/24, G01V3/18 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
G01V3/24 (EP);
G01V11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL [1993/52] | Title | German: | IN EINEM VERROHRTEN BOHRLOCH BEWEGBARES ELEKTRONISCHES MESSGERÄT MIT KOMPENSATION VON WIDERSTANDSUNTERSCHIEDEN IN DER VERROHRUNG | [1995/38] | English: | AN ELECTRONIC MEASUREMENT APPARATUS MOVABLE IN A CASED BOREHOLE AND COMPENSATING FOR CASING RESISTANCE DIFFERENCES | [1993/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE ELECTRONIQUE MOBILE A L'INTERIEUR D'UN PUITS REVETU DE TUBE ET COMPENSANT DES DIFFERENCES DE RESISTANCE DE REVETEMENT | [1995/38] |
Former [1993/52] | IN EINEM VEROHRTEN BOHRLOCH BEWEGBARES ELEKTRONISCHES MESSGERÄT UND KOMPENSATION FÜR WIDERSTANDDIFFERENZEN IN DER VERRÖHRUNG | ||
Former [1993/52] | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE ELECTRONIQUE MOBILE A L'INTERIEUR D'UN PUITS REVETU DE BETON ET COMPENSANT LES DIFFERENCES DE RESISTANCE DU REVETEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1993 | Search fee paid | 30.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 18.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2371658 ; | [A]US2459196 ; | [A]US2587518 ; | [A]US2729784 ; | [A]US2891215 ; | [Y]US4796186 ; | [X]US4820989 ; | [Y]US4837518 ; | [XY]WO8803657 ; | [Y]SU1345151 |