Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0481042
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
23.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
17.05.1996 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] |
12.04.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] |
16.02.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] |
26.01.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] |
25.05.1995 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] |
09.11.1993 |
First examination report |
|
06.03.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] |
06.03.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] |