EP0524256 - Applicator for any liquid product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/04] | DEVICE FOR SEALING A LIQUID PRODUCT APPLICATOR, AND APPLICATOR USABLE THEREWITH | ||
[1995/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L V M H RECHERCHE 50, rue de la Seine F-92700 Colombes / FR | [1993/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LHUISSET, François, Noel, Benoît 104, avenue de la Grange F-91230 Montgeron / FR | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91908194.3 | 11.04.1991 | [1993/04] | WO1991FR00304 | Priority number, date | FR19900004752 | 12.04.1990 Original published format: FR 9004752 | [1993/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115974 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524256 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524256 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
A45D34/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU [1993/04] | Title | German: | Auftragsgerät zum Auftragen einer beliebigen Flüssigkeit | [1995/45] | English: | Applicator for any liquid product | [1995/45] | French: | Appareil applicateur de produit liquide quelconque | [1995/45] |
Former [1993/04] | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN GERÄT ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON FLÜSSIGEN ERZEUGNISSEN UND AUFTRAGSGERÄT MIT DIESER VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [1993/04] | DEVICE FOR SEALING A LIQUID PRODUCT APPLICATOR, AND APPLICATOR USABLE THEREWITH | ||
Former [1993/04] | DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION D'UN APPAREIL APPLICATEUR DE PRODUIT LIQUIDE QUELCONQUE ET APPAREIL APPLICATEUR UTILISABLE AVEC CE DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 21.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 04.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2887708 (KANE ALAN H); | [A]DE3635690 (GEKA BRUSH GEORG KARL GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4902152 (SEIDLER DAVID [US]) |