Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] |
24.02.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] |
20.04.1994 | First examination report | |
12.07.1993 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] |
24.03.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] |
21.02.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] |