EP0525101 - POLYBENZAZOLE POLYMERS CONTAINING INDAN MOIETIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMMERS, John, D. 26 Mary Jane New Town Square, PA 19073 / US | 02 /
WESSLING, Ritchie, A. 1126 Shattuck Avenue Berkeley, CA 94707 / US | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1993/05] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 91908837.7 | 01.04.1991 | [1993/05] | WO1991US02164 | Priority number, date | US19900513316 | 20.04.1990 Original published format: US 513316 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9116121 | Date: | 31.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525101 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22, B01D71/56, C08G73/22 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
C08G73/22 (EP,US);
B01D71/62 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/05] | B01D53/22, B01D71/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | INDANANTEILE ENTHALTENDE POLYBENZAZOLPOLYMERE | [1993/05] | English: | POLYBENZAZOLE POLYMERS CONTAINING INDAN MOIETIES | [1993/05] | French: | POLYMERES DE POLYBENZAZOLE CONTENANT DES FRACTIONS D'INDANE | [1993/05] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1992 | Search fee paid | 13.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2211193 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO8912072 (FOSTER MILLER INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3951920 (SENOO MASAO, et al); | [A]US4157960 (CHANG RICHARD C [US], et al); | [A]US4172885 (PERRY ELI [US]); | [A]US4180552 (GRAHAM TOMMY E [US], et al); | [A]US4323453 (ZAMPINI ANTHONY); | [A]US4662905 (MATSUURA JUNICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4783203 (DOSHI KISHORE J [US]); | [A]US4898924 (CHENEVEY EDWARD C [US], et al) |