EP0483317 - STRAP WITH HINGED LINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHIRAZI, Victor 8, rue du marché CH-1204 Genève / CH | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | KIRKER & Cie S.A. 122 rue de Genève, Case Postale 65 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | KIRKER & Cie S.A. 122 rue de Genève, Case Postale 65 CH-1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | ||
Former [1994/01] | Micheli, Michel-Pierre c/o Kirker & Cie S.A. Rue du Mont Blanc P.O. Box 1736 CH-1211 Geneva 1 / CH | ||
Former [1992/19] | Kirker, Gaylord Emile c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, Rue du Mont-Blanc Case postale 1736 CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH | Application number, filing date | 91909031.6 | 16.05.1991 | [1992/19] | WO1991CH00118 | Priority number, date | CH19900001719 | 21.05.1990 Original published format: CH 171990 | CH19910001426 | 14.05.1991 Original published format: CH 142691 | [1992/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117679 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483317 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/10 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
A44C5/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | GLIEDERARMBAND | [1992/19] | English: | STRAP WITH HINGED LINKS | [1992/19] | French: | BRACELET A MAILLONS ARTICULES | [1992/19] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/07] | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH653224 (G ET F CHATELAIN S A); | [A]CH661184 (FINGER H FA); | [A]FR2561879 (TUPPINI REMIGIO [IT]); | [A]CH655836 (BIELNA FABRIQUE DE BOITES SA) |