Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05508896 | Global Dossier | 09.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9100296 | 25.04.1991 | SE9001541 | 27.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9117355 | Global Dossier | 14.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9001541 | 27.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0526574 | Global Dossier | 10.02.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9001541 | 27.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE9001541L | 28.10.1991 | L | SE9001541D0 | 27.04.1990 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9001541 | 27.04.1990 |