Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0820180B | Global Dossier | 04.03.1996 | B2 | JPH05500263 | 21.01.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9100916 | 16.05.1991 | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0483322 | Global Dossier | 10.08.1994 | B1 | EP0483322 | 06.05.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9100916 | 16.05.1991 | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9105760 | 08.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9100916 | 16.05.1991 | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59102492D1 | 15.09.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE59102492 | 16.05.1991 | EP9100916 | 16.05.1991 | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI95814C | 25.03.1996 | C | FI95814B | 15.12.1995 | B | Priority number | Date | EP9100916 | 16.05.1991 | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR920703850 | 18.12.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9100916 | 16.05.1991 | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2044977 | 27.09.1995 | C1 | Priority number | Date | EP9100916 | 16.05.1991 | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9118120 | Global Dossier | 28.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU634889B | Global Dossier | 04.03.1993 | B2 | AU7863991 | 10.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE109837T | 15.08.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2063562 | 11.03.1997 | C | CA2063562 | 18.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1041557C | 06.01.1999 | C | CN1056567 | 27.11.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4015916 | 21.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0483322T | 26.09.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2072612T | 16.07.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU209854 | 28.11.1994 | B | HUT61812 | 01.03.1993 | A | HU9200145D0 | 28.04.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX173918 | 08.04.1994 | B | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT97697 | 31.12.1998 | B | PT97697 | 30.06.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR25664 | 01.07.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5264020 | 23.11.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA913708 | 26.02.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | DE4015916 | 17.05.1990 |