EP0483322 - SMELTING PLANT WITH TWO ADJACENT SMELTING FURNACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuchs Technology AG Chamerstrasse 50 (c/o Gestinor Services AG) CH-6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states Fuchs Technology AG Chamerstrasse 50 (c/o Gestinor Services AG) CH-6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHLE, Joachim Spitzenbergstra e 7b D-7606 Lautenbach / DE | 02 /
FUCHS, Gerhard Eschigweg 1 D-7640 Kehl-Bodersweier / DE | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/19] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91909420.1 | 16.05.1991 | [1992/19] | WO1991EP00916 | Priority number, date | DE19904015916 | 17.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4015916 | [1992/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118120 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483322 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483322 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/52, F27B3/04, F27D3/00 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
F27B3/04 (EP,US);
C21C5/52 (KR);
C21C5/5252 (EP,US);
F27B3/085 (EP,US);
F27B3/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | EINSCHMELZAGGREGAT MIT ZWEI NEBENEINANDER ANGEORDNETEN SCHMELZÖFEN | [1992/19] | English: | SMELTING PLANT WITH TWO ADJACENT SMELTING FURNACES | [1992/19] | French: | INSTALLATION DE FUSION A DEUX FOURS DE FUSION ADJACENTS | [1992/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.1995
08.06.1995
ADMISSIBLE Mannesmann AG Mannesmannufer 2 D-40213 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Meissner, Peter E. (DE) Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | [1995/28] | 13.06.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.10.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.01.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/14] | Appeal following opposition | 19.07.1996 | Appeal received No. T0677/96 | 23.09.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.01.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.08.1994 | AT | 16.05.1999 | GB | 16.05.1999 | LU | 16.05.1999 | ES | 17.05.1999 | SE | 17.05.1999 | BE | 31.05.1999 | CH | 31.05.1999 | DK | 31.05.1999 | LI | 31.05.1999 | GR | 30.11.1999 | [2005/24] |
Former [2004/50] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
GB | 16.05.1999 | ||
LU | 16.05.1999 | ||
ES | 17.05.1999 | ||
SE | 17.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
CH | 31.05.1999 | ||
DK | 31.05.1999 | ||
LI | 31.05.1999 | ||
GR | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2004/39] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
GB | 16.05.1999 | ||
LU | 16.05.1999 | ||
ES | 17.05.1999 | ||
SE | 17.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
CH | 31.05.1999 | ||
DK | 31.05.1999 | ||
LI | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2004/38] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
GB | 16.05.1999 | ||
ES | 17.05.1999 | ||
SE | 17.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
CH | 31.05.1999 | ||
DK | 31.05.1999 | ||
LI | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
GB | 16.05.1999 | ||
SE | 17.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
CH | 31.05.1999 | ||
DK | 31.05.1999 | ||
LI | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2002/45] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
GB | 16.05.1999 | ||
SE | 17.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
CH | 31.05.1999 | ||
LI | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/51] | CH | 10.08.1994 | |
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
GB | 16.05.1999 | ||
SE | 17.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/50] | CH | 10.08.1994 | |
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
GB | 16.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/05] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
GB | 16.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | NL | 10.08.1994 | |
AT | 16.05.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [1995/15] | NL | 10.08.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB895534 (MEREDITH WOODRIDGE THRING); | [A]DE1433424 (KRUPP GMBH); | [Y]DE1937839 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH); | [Y]DE3232139 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]); | [A]DE8412739U ; | [A]EP0170809 (FUCHS SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) |