EP0530311 - THE USE OF PHENYLPROPANOLAMINE AS A MUCUS SECRETAGOGUE IN THE UPPER AIRWAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norwich-Eaton Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 17 Eaton Avenue Norwich, New York 13815 / US | [1993/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHIPPS, Roger, John 36 Chenango Avenue Sherburne, NY 13460 / US | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91911164.1 | 17.05.1991 | [1993/10] | WO1991US03453 | Priority number, date | US19900526218 | 21.05.1990 Original published format: US 526218 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117746 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530311 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/621 (EP);
A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K31/42 (EP);
A61K31/43 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/485 (EP);
A61K31/495 (EP);
A61K31/505 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/135, A61K31/055, A61K31/045, A61K31/09 (EP);
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/195, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/42, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/54, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/54, A61K31/485, A61K31/43, A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/60, A61K31/505, A61K31/42, A61K31/495, A61K31/445, A61K31/44, A61K31/195, A61K31/165, A61K31/19, A61K31/135 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/10] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PHENYLPROPANOLAMIN ALS IM OBEREN RESPIRATIONSTRAKT WIRKENDES DIE SCHLEIMSEKRETION FÖRDERNDES MITTEL | [1993/10] | English: | THE USE OF PHENYLPROPANOLAMINE AS A MUCUS SECRETAGOGUE IN THE UPPER AIRWAYS | [1993/10] | French: | UTILISATION DE PHENYLPROPANOLAMINE COMME SECRETAGOGUE MUQUEUX DES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES SUPERIEURES | [1993/10] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 30.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/51] | 24.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/51] | Request for further processing for: | 20.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4818541 (SANDERSON JOHN E [US]) | [X] - The Journal of Pediatrics, vol. 101, no. 1, June 1982, The C.V. Mosby Co., D.M. Moran et al.: "The use of an antihistamine-decongestant in conjunction with an anti-infective drug in the treatment of acute otitis media", pages 132-136, see the whole article | [X] - MARTINDALE The Extra Pharmacopoeia, 29th edition, edited by J.E.F. Reynolds, 1989, The Pharmaceutical Press, (London, GB), pages 1475-1477, see monographe 2095-q: "Phenylpropanolamine hydrochloride" | [X] - American Drug Index, 26th Edition, N.F. Billups, 1982, J.B. Lippincott Co., (Philadelphia, US), page 227, see "Entex" | [X] - The Merck Manual of Diagnosis and Therapy, 15th edition, R. Berkow, 1987, Merck Sharp & Dohme Research Laboratories, (Rahway, N.J., US), see pages 2180,2181,2196,2197 | [A] - Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, vol. 76, no. 2, February 1987, American Pharmaceutical Association, F.A. Moya-Huff et al.: "Cardiovascular differences between phenylpropanolamine and its related norephedrine isomers in the rat", pages 114-116, see the whole article | [A] - The FASEB Journal, vol. 2, no. 5, 20 March 1988, abstract 5388, M. Eisenberg et al.: "A comparison of anorectic and locomotor response to d,l-norephedrine, its component and related isomers", page A1223, see the abstract |