EP0495985 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE MACHINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SODICK CO., LTD. 5-1 Shinyokohama 1-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222 / JP | [1992/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Yuji 84-214, Shikimidai, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241 / JP | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91911339.9 | 20.06.1991 | [1992/31] | WO1991JP00828 | Priority number, date | JP19900215252 | 14.08.1990 Original published format: JP 21525290 | [1992/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9203246 | Date: | 05.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495985 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495985 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23H1/02 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
B23H7/04 (EP,US);
B23H1/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FUNKENEROSIONSBEARBEITEN | [1992/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRICAL DISCHARGE MACHINING | [1992/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'USINAGE PAR ETINCELAGE | [1992/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.1992 | Translation filed | 14.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.1992 | Search fee paid | 14.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0176224 (INOUE JAPAX RES [JP]) | International search | JPS5926414B [ ] | Examination | JPH05926414B |