EP0540532 - TRANSPARENT INDICIA EMBOSSED FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGERS, Wallace, S. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SIPINEN, Alan, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91911568.3 | 16.05.1991 | [1993/19] | WO1991US03471 | Priority number, date | US19900558614 | 26.07.1990 Original published format: US 558614 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201759 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540532 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0540532 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, A61F13/58 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
A61F13/58 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/19] | Title | German: | DURCHSICHTIGES BAND MIT GEPRÄGTEN KENNZEICHNUNGEN | [1993/19] | English: | TRANSPARENT INDICIA EMBOSSED FILM | [1993/19] | French: | FILM GAUFFRE A REPAIRES TRANSPARENT | [1993/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1443736 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [A]FR1535226 (DYMO INDUSTRIES INC); | [A]US3690999 (SETZER HENRY J); | [A]GB2135568 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON); | [A]US4662875 (HIROTSU DENNIS O [US], et al) |