EP0533811 - CONNECTOR FOR INTERCONNECTING CONDUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPHA THAMES ENGINEERING LIMITED Essex House Station Road Upminster Essex RM14 2SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states ALPHA THAMES ENGINEERING LIMITED Essex House Station Road Upminster Essex RM14 2SU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APPLEFORD, David Eric 5 Green View Cottages Theydon Bois, Essex CM16 7JD / GB | 02 /
NEIGHBOUR, James 5 Kinnoul Road London W6 8NG / GB | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91911978.4 | 14.06.1991 | [1993/13] | WO1991GB00967 | Priority number, date | GB19900013439 | 15.06.1990 Original published format: GB 9013439 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119927 | Date: | 26.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533811 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533811 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/00 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
F16L37/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | VERBINDER ZUR VERBINDUNG VON ROHREN | [1993/13] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR INTERCONNECTING CONDUITS | [1993/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT POUR CONDUITS COMMUNIQUANT ENTRE EUX | [1993/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Request for further processing for: | 09.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1995 | 30.06.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.1997 | BE | 02.04.1997 | CH | 02.04.1997 | DK | 02.04.1997 | ES | 02.04.1997 | FR | 02.04.1997 | GR | 02.04.1997 | IT | 02.04.1997 | LI | 02.04.1997 | NL | 02.04.1997 | LU | 14.06.1997 | SE | 02.07.1997 | DE | 03.07.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
CH | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
ES | 02.04.1997 | ||
FR | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
LI | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 14.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
Former [2004/35] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
CH | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
ES | 02.04.1997 | ||
FR | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
LI | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
CH | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
ES | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
LI | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
CH | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
LI | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
CH | 07.07.1997 | ||
LI | 07.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
GR | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
IT | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
DK | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
SE | 02.07.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
BE | 02.04.1997 | ||
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 02.04.1997 | |
NL | 02.04.1997 | ||
DE | 03.07.1997 | ||
FR | 29.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 02.04.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2158535 (GRIPPER INC); | [A]EP0260237 (NORSKE STATS OLJESELSKAP [NO], et al); | [A]GB2197407 (KVAERNER BRUG KJOLEAVDELNING) |